skip to content

Raza, Samir

CPSO#: 93805

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room A3-15
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 43834
Fax: 905-575-7320 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 main st west
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 43834
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Raza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raza ( CPSO# 93805 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room A3-15
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3N5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMIR RAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014