skip to content

Rayment, Jonathan

CPSO#: 95441

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Ave Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Instructions: Medical record location as per above
Date Received: 26 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 2018