skip to content

Rayar, Praveen Keshava

CPSO#: 95334

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Praveen Rayar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: ErinoakKids 10145 McVean Drive Brampton ON L6P 4K7 208-178 John Street Brampton ON L6W 2A4
Date Received: 12 Jun 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Pediatrics Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2019