skip to content

Ray, Christopher Patrick

CPSO#: 95287

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HWMH - Operating Room
400 Broad Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone: 9057747431 Ext. 1324
Fax: 9057016363 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher P. Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ray ( CPSO# 95287 )

Business Address:
9444 Concession 3 Rd.
Caistor Centre ON  L0R 1E0

Business Address:
HWMH - Operating Room
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (519) 800-8847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PATRICK RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2014