skip to content

Shenava, Ravishankar Thimmangur

CPSO#: 60275

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 18 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Tulu

Education:Mysore University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shenava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Oct 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2018
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jun 2019
Summary:

On June 18, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ravishankar Thimmangur Shenava 
(“Dr. Shenava”) committed an act of professional misconduct in that:  he has been found guilty 
of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice; he has engaged in an act or omission relevant 
to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and he has failed to 
maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients.  
 
Dr. Shenava is a 68-year-old psychiatrist.  At the relevant times, he was practicing medicine in 
Windsor, Ontario.  He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 
Ontario in 1988 and his specialist qualification in psychiatry in 1987. 

Guilty of Offence Relevant to Dr. Shenava’s Suitability to Practice 

On September 6, 2018, Dr. Shenava pleaded guilty and was found guilty of three counts of 
assault contrary to s.266 of the Criminal Code of Canada in proceedings before Thomas J., 
Superior Court of Justice at Windsor, Ontario. The findings of guilt pertain to Patients F, K and 
L in the Notice of Hearing. 

Disgraceful, Dishonourable or Unprofessional Conduct 

Dr. Shenava admits that, based on the facts admitted at the criminal proceedings, he engaged in 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patients F, K and L. 

With respect to the remaining patients in the Notice of Hearing, Dr. Shenava engaged in 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in the following ways: 

   -  hugging patients without consent, asking for hugs from patients, touching patients’ legs, 
      backs and arms; 
   -  failing to maintain spatial boundaries, including by sitting too close to patients and 
      making patients uncomfortable with his proximity to them; 
   -  making inappropriate personal comments to some patients. 
       
Failure to Maintain Standard of Practice  

As part of an investigation into whether Dr. Shenava failed to maintain the standard of practice, 
the College retained Dr. David Cochrane, psychiatrist.   

Dr. Cochrane provided a report dated February 28, 2019.  Dr. Cochrane found that in all twenty-
two of twenty-two (22/22) charts he reviewed, Dr. Shenava failed to maintain the standard of 
practice in his clinical documentation, clinical care and the management of boundaries and 
transference enactments. 

Disposition 

On June 18, 2019, the Committee ordered that: 
-  The Registrar revoke Dr. Shenava’s certificate of registration, effective immediately. 
-  Dr. Shenava attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Shenava pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days 
   of the date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): June 18, 2019 half day hearing commencing at 9:00 a.m.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Other
Active Date: September 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Finding(s)

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following are findings of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On September 6, 2018, Ravi T. Shenava was found guilty of three counts of assault against three persons contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada and sentenced to two years’ probation. Dr. Shenava was ordered to pay a fine of $3,000, plus a victim surcharge of $900. He was also ordered:

(a) not to associate, contact or communicate with five specified persons;
(b) not to be within 100 metres of any known place of employment, residence or education of five specified persons;
(c) to resign his license to practise medicine with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and not reapply to practise medicine in Canada; and
(d) not to act in Canada as a counsellor to patients in the future.


Source: Member
Active Date: October 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ravishankar Thimmangur Shenava to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 13, 2017:

Dr. Shenava is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Shenava must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Shenava’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Shenava must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Shenava shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Shenava must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Shenava must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.


Source: Member
Active Date: June 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ravishankar Thimmangur Shenava to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 14, 2016:

Dr. Shenava is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he engaged in sexual abuse of patients and conduct in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Shenava must not engage in any professional encounter with any female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction.

Dr. Shenava shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination room and consulting room, in all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Shenava must not see female patients or have any professional encounter with any female patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.