skip to content

Raviele, Anelia Konstantinova

CPSO#: 94593

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Russian

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Raviele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raviele ( CPSO# 94593 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:26 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015 Active
 Dr.  Anelia  Konstantinova  Raviele  may  practice  medicine  independently  in
            psychiatry.