Ravichandran, Pranavi (CPSO#: 100666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
16700 Bayview Ave
Newmarket ON  L3X1W1
Phone: 9059530637
Fax: 9059530943
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 209
5293 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P7M7
Canada
Phone: 2893016622
Fax: 2893016621
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRANAVI RAVICHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVICHANDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018