Ravi, Deepti Mary (CPSO#: 98508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor, Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 5920
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 360-4000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPTI MARY RAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017