skip to content

Raveendran, Arulanantham

CPSO#: 97326

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manhattan Medical Centre
411 Manhattan Drive
Unit 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P4
Phone: (905) 947-4400
Fax: (905) 947-0589 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arulanantham Raveendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raveendran ( CPSO# 97326 )

Business Address:
Manhattan Medical Centre
411 Manhattan Drive
Unit 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P4
Phone Number: (905) 947-4400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARULANANTHAM RAVEENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVEENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012