skip to content

Ravani, Shirin

CPSO#: 91550

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Dec 2021 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIRIN RAVANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2021