skip to content

Raut-Deshpande, Pooja

CPSO#: 93649

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Deshpande, Pooja (used until: 13 May 2014 )     Raut, Pooja (used until: 25 Apr 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Avenue
Department of Internal Medicine
St. Catharines Site
Niagara Health System
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. Raut-Deshpande Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Raut-Deshpande ( CPSO# 93649 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
Niagara Health System
Department of Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
A Wing
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 1A7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. POOJA RAUT-DESHPANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUT-DESHPANDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014