skip to content

Raut, Abhishek

CPSO#: 89055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106-1971 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (647) 490-6330 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2025 Midland Ave
Toronto ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (647) 490-6330
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raut ( CPSO# 89055 )

Business Address:
1971 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABHISHEK RAUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012