skip to content

Rauh, Michael John

CPSO#: 87025

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Richardson Laboratory
Dept of Pathology & Molecular Med
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2820
Fax: (613) 533-2907 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael J. Rauh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rauh ( CPSO# 87025 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Richardson Laboratory
Dept of Pathology & Molecular Medicine
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2818

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN RAUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011