skip to content

Ratnanather, Kingsley Vincent Jeyam

CPSO#: 24871

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Apartment 112 1750 Lawrence Avenue West Toronto, ON M6L 3C4
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Ratnanather at 416-245-2538 or write to him to request medical record information.
Date Received: 06 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 2015

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 24, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kingsley Vincent Ratnanather has resigned from the College.