skip to content

Rathbun, James Broatch

CPSO#: 20853

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1967
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C07 - 3000 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 267-2334
Fax: (416) 267-2539 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James Broatch Rathbun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rathbun ( CPSO# 20853 )

Business Address:
C07 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 267-2334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:06 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES BROATCH RATHBUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHBUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)