Rasuli, Kevin James (CPSO#: 100556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
W1637 Box 502
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Rasuli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rasuli ( CPSO# 100556)
Dr. P. Rasuli ( CPSO# 51468 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
Suite 214
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L6

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 782-9804

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN JAMES RASULI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RASULI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. RASULI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RASULI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RASULI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RASULI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RASULI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 08 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019