skip to content

Rastogi, Indra Prabha

CPSO#: 21621

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Hamilton Academy of Medicine Unit 206 1 Young Street Hamilton, Ontario L8N 1T8 Tel: (905) 528-1640
Date Received: 05 Aug 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:18 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013