skip to content

Rassouli, Seyed Alipasha

CPSO#: 86655

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1415 1st Ave West
Suite # 3004
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (226)909-3590
Fax: 226-277-0888 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rassouli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rassouli ( CPSO# 86655 )

Business Address:
3004-1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (226) 909-3590

Business Address:
102-10 Keith Avenue
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0W5
Phone Number: (226) 909-3590


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEYED ALIPASHA RASSOULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASSOULI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014