skip to content

Raso, Dean Andrew

CPSO#: 86220

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dean A. Raso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
Corporation Name: Dr. Dean A. Raso and Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Raso ( CPSO# 86220 )
Dr. A. Chittle ( CPSO# 88446 )

Business Address:
Suite 130
235 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 4N5
Phone Number: (519) 743-9360

Business Address:
SA/DV Care and Treatment Centre
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
Sanguen Health Centre
29 Young Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 603-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEAN ANDREW RASO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 10 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011