skip to content

Rasalingam, Pamini

CPSO#: 91951

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G2B8
Phone: (905)8730111 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Dundas St. East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613)969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

199 Princess Anne Dr.
Georgetown ON  L7G0E3
Canada
Phone: 905-873-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMINI RASALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
AVP - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2016