skip to content

Rappaport, Henrietta Sophie

CPSO#: 28272

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 306
3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 225-8499
Fax: 416) 225-1089 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rappaport ( CPSO# 28272 )
Dr. M. Maarse ( CPSO# 93068 )
Dr. D. Burns ( CPSO# 97552 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Ren Ee Choo 1333 Sheppard Ave. East Suite 216 Toronto, ON M2J1V1
Date Received: 27 Apr 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:11 Mar 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HENRIETTA SOPHIE RAPPAPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPPAPORT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976