skip to content

Rappaport, Henrietta Sophie

CPSO#: 28272

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University Of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Ren Ee Choo 1333 Sheppard Ave. East Suite 216 Toronto, ON M2J1V1
Date Received: 27 Apr 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:11 Mar 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020