Raphael, David Jay (CPSO#: 98485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
801 Mohawk Rd W
Suite 203
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone: (905) 318-5119
Fax: (905) 318-2151
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 York St
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Nathanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Raphael ( CPSO# 97846 )
Dr. D. Raphael ( CPSO# 98485 )
Dr. B. Nathanson ( CPSO# 27665 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
801 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone Number: (905) 318-5119

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 318-5119


Corporation Name: David Jay Raphael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Raphael ( CPSO# 98485 )

Business Address:
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
Unit 203
801 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone Number: (905) 318-5119

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAY RAPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014