skip to content

Raouf-Alkadhimi, Ahmed Fouad

CPSO#: 89638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Acton Medical And
Urgent Care Clinic
10 Eastern Avenue
Acton ON  L7J 0A5
Phone: (519) 853-4449
Fax: (519) 853-5242 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raouf-Alkadhimi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raouf-Alkadhimi ( CPSO# 89638 )

Business Address:
Acton Medical and Urgent Care Clinic
10 Eastern Avenue
Acton ON  L7J 0A5
Phone Number: (519) 853-4449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED FOUAD RAOUF-ALKADHIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAOUF-ALKADHIMI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)