skip to content

Raoof, Shariqa

CPSO#: 94339

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 566-1010
Fax: (905) 566-0440 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

420 North Service Road East, Suite2
Briarwood Business Park
Oakville ON  L6H 5R2
Canada
Phone: (905) 338-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Raoof Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raoof ( CPSO# 94339 )

Business Address:
Tri-Hospital Sleep Laboratory West
208 - 3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 566-1010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2012 Active
             Dr. Shariqa Raoof may practice medicine independently in sleep medicine, only.