skip to content

Rao, Venkat Bheemsen

CPSO#: 22486

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Osmania University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 7 - 900 King Street West Kitchener ON N2G 1G5
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018