Rao, Purnima Minnie (CPSO#: 100039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
501 Smyth Road
Critical Care Wing 1401
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 737 8899 Ext. 78187
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Purnima Rao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rao ( CPSO# 100039)

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Critical Care Wing 1401
Box 249
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PURNIMA MINNIE RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 06 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015