skip to content

Rao, Adarsh Sathish

CPSO#: 98331

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
755 Queensway E
Suite 304
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4C5
Phone: (905) 826-4048
Fax: (905) 826-7201 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adarsh Rao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rao ( CPSO# 98331 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:03 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADARSH SATHISH RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020