skip to content

Ranney, Donald Alan

CPSO#: 17270

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom
USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017