skip to content

Rankin, Wayne Malcolm

CPSO#: 29921

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 May 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wayne M. Rankin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2020

Medical Records Location

Instructions: patients seeking access to a copy of their record can contact Dr. Sean Richard Daniel Peterson located at 481 London Rd, Sarnia, ON, N7T 4X3
Date Received: 09 Jul 2021


Instructions: Patients seeking access to a copy of their record can contact Dr. Sean Richard Daniel Peterson (CPSO 86555) located at 481 London Rd, Sarnia, ON, N7T 4X3
Date Received: 08 Jul 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020