skip to content

Rankin, Richard Neal

CPSO#: 28819

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.N. Rankin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013