skip to content

Ranger, Nathalie Stefania

CPSO#: 100355

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: 519-824-1010 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. N. S. Ranger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ranger ( CPSO# 100355)

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHALIE STEFANIA RANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2016