skip to content

Ranaweera, Kumudini

CPSO#: 94557

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Ruhuna, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone: (519) 888-4567 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kumudini Ranaweera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ranaweera ( CPSO# 94557 )

Business Address:
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone Number: (519) 888-4990

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KUMUDINI RANAWEERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANAWEERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 23 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2013