Ranawaya, Jose (CPSO#: 98598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Regional Pediatric Services
Consulting Group
Suite 303 &305
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 779-7575
Fax: (613)779-8686
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose Ranawaya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ranawaya ( CPSO# 98598 )

Business Address:
QHC Regional Pediatric Services
Consulting Group
Suite 303 & 305
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K6N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE RANAWAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANAWAYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016