skip to content

Rana, Shreyas Kanu

CPSO#: 94440

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 HWY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill ON  L3B 0B3
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K2N7
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rana ( CPSO# 94440 )

Business Address:
Unit A6
130 Hwy 20 East
Fonthill ON  L3B 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 892-1010


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois
USA - New York
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
 Dr. Shreyas Kanu Rana may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.