skip to content

Rana, Robina Iftikhar

CPSO#: 95315

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Professional Building
679 Davis Drive
Unit 204
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 235-8881
Fax: 905-235-8861 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Diabetes Education Centre
The Tannery Mall
465 Davis Drive, Suite 213
Newmarket ON  L3Y 7T9
Canada
Phone: (905)895-4521 Ext. 5650
Fax: (905)853-3180
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robina Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rana ( CPSO# 95315 )

Business Address:
8730 The Gore Road
Brampton ON  L6P 0B1

Business Address:
Diabetes Education Centre
213-465 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 7T9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Suite 204
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 235-8881


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBINA IFTIKHAR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015