skip to content

Rana, Jesleen Kaur

CPSO#: 97849

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's Health in Women's Hands
Suite 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J3
Phone: (416) 593-7655 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Jessie's Centre
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416 591 4411
Fax: 416 640 2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rana ( CPSO# 97849 )

Business Address:
Unit 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 593-7655

Business Address:
205 Parliament Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2Z4
Phone Number: (416) 365-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESLEEN KAUR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014