skip to content

Ramzan, Sarah

CPSO#: 97923

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jane and Finch FHT
136A
1 Yorkgate Blvd
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

8865 Yonge St Unit B6
Toronto ON  L4C 6Z1
Canada
Phone: (905) 763-2001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Ramzan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramzan ( CPSO# 97923 )

Business Address:
8865 Yonge Street
Unit B6
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z1
Phone Number: (905) 763-2001

Business Address:
136A - 1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 745-4555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH RAMZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMZAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014