skip to content

Ramprashad, Claudius Arthur

CPSO#: 21587

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Ramprashad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012