skip to content

Rampersad, Gregory Claude Anil

CPSO#: 95719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital Site
Dept of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4444 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Rampersad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rampersad ( CPSO# 95719 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
Emergency Department
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY CLAUDE ANIL RAMPERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMPERSAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2014