skip to content

Ramonas, Milita

CPSO#: 92785

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Milita Ramonas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ramonas ( CPSO# 92785 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILITA RAMONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMONAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 28 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 28 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2016