skip to content

Rammal, Almotasembillah Abdulaziz M

CPSO#: 97422

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685 8500 Ext. 53563 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective:03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2012 to 01 Jun 2012
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
 1.    Dr. Almotasembillah Abdulaziz M Rammal may practise internal medicine and
                  gastroenterology   with   London  Health  Sciences  Centre  -  University
                  Hospital, London Health Sciences  Centre  -  Victoria  Hospital  and  St.
                  Joseph's Hospital in London, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Rammal's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does  not provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College by the due date or if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Rammal's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2019,  and will expire on or before
                  June 30, 2022, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.