skip to content

Ramlogan, Reva Reeshard

CPSO#: 91332

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (647) 637-8751 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reva Ramlogan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramlogan ( CPSO# 91332 )

Business Address:
Suite B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 637-8751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REVA REESHARD RAMLOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMLOGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2015