skip to content

Ramien, Michele Louise

CPSO#: 88661

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michele Ramien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Kemptville District Hospital 2675 Concession Rd Kemptville ON K0G 1J0 Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario 401 Smyth Rd Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 15 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 May 2019