skip to content

Ramaswamy, Vijay

CPSO#: 96525

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division Of Hematology/Oncology
10-408 Black, 555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202081
Fax: (416) 813-5327 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIJAY RAMASWAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMASWAMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011