skip to content

Ramanathan, Usha

CPSO#: 90189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Usha Ramanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Ramanathan ( CPSO# 90189 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 285-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. USHA RAMANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012