skip to content

Raman, Srinivas Venkata

CPSO#: 100600

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SRINIVAS VENKATA RAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2019