skip to content

Ramadan, Samir Ibrahim

CPSO#: 95513

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records to be kept at Port Credit Medical Centre - Mississauga & MCI Walk In Doctors office - Toronto (the clinics Dr. worked in before he left Ontario, effective October 15, 2013)
Instructions: Patient to contact clinic where they saw Dr. Ramadan
Date Received: 12 Sep 2013


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2017