Ramachandran, Shruthi (CPSO#: 98893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Karnatak Institute of Medical Science, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHRUTHI RAMACHANDRAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAMACHANDRAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RAMACHANDRAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAMACHANDRAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RAMACHANDRAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAMACHANDRAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAMACHANDRAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018