skip to content

Ramachandran, Puttur Rangaswamy

CPSO#: 22114

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
18 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Mysore University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 2021